Senate | 05/05/2022 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Public Act 22-4 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Emergency Certification |