Senate | 04/14/2022 | House Calendar Number 368 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | File Number 255 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 208 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Vote to Draft |