Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00003 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/04/2022

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00003-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 2 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 3  
February Session, 2022 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE BOARD OF REGENTS FOR HIGHER 
EDUCATION TO DEVELOP SEMINAR PROGRAMS FOR SMALL 
BUSINESSES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) For the purposes of this 1 
section: 2 
(1) "Small business" means a business located in the state with 3 
twenty-five employees or less; 4 
(2) "Cybersecurity" means the detection, prevention or response to 5 
activity intended to result in unauthorized access to, exfiltration of, 6 
manipulation of, or impairment to the integrity, confidentiality or 7 
availability of an information technology system or information stored 8 
on, or transiting, an information technology system; and 9 
(3) "Virtual currency" has the same meaning as provided in section 10 
36a-596 of the general statutes. 11 
(b) Not later than September 1, 2022, the Board of Regents for Higher 12 
Education shall, within available funds, develop seminar programs to 13 
assist small businesses with adapting to the business environment in the 14 
aftermath of the COVID-19 pandemic, as defined in section 4-216a of the 15  Substitute Bill No. 3 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00003-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
general statutes, through courses in subject areas, including, but not 16 
limited to, electronic commerce, social media, cybersecurity and virtual 17 
currency. Said board shall prescribe forms and procedures by which not 18 
more than two employees of any small business may enroll in not more 19 
than five seminar programs or any course within such seminar 20 
programs at the Northwestern Connecticut Community College 21 
Entrepreneurial Center or the Werth Innovation and Entrepreneurial 22 
Center at Housatonic Community College at no cost to such small 23 
business. 24 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2022) For the fiscal years ending June 30, 2023, 25 
and June 30, 2024, the Board of Regents for Higher Education may 26 
expend funds received by the state pursuant to the American Rescue 27 
Plan Act of 2021, P.L. 117-2, as amended from time to time, for the 28 
purpose of developing seminar programs for small businesses pursuant 29 
to section 1 of this act. 30 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2022 New section 
 
HED Joint Favorable Subst.