Senate | 04/14/2022 | File Number 475 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 323 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |