Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00016 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/14/2022

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00016-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 5 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 16  
February Session, 2022 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ADDRESSING GUN VIOLENCE.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 29-38e of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2022): 2 
(a) There shall be within the Division of State Police, within the 3 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, a state-wide 4 
firearms [trafficking] crimes and tracing task force for the effective 5 
cooperative enforcement of the laws of this state concerning the 6 
distribution and possession of firearms. 7 
(b) The task force shall be comprised of municipal and state law 8 
enforcement officers and may include federal law enforcement officers. 9 
Such task force shall be authorized to conduct any investigation 10 
authorized by this section at any place within the state as may be 11 
deemed necessary. 12 
(c) The task force may request and may receive from any federal, state 13 
or local agency, cooperation and assistance in the performance of its 14 
duties, including the temporary assignment of personnel which may be 15 
necessary to carry out the performance of its functions. 16 
(d) The task force may enter into mutual assistance and cooperation 17  Substitute Bill No. 16 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00016-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 5 
 
agreements with other states pertaining to firearms law enforcement 18 
matters extending across state boundaries, and may consult and 19 
exchange information and personnel with agencies of other states with 20 
reference to firearms law enforcement problems of mutual concern. 21 
(e) The Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection 22 
may appoint [a commanding officer and] such [other] personnel as the 23 
commissioner deems necessary for the duties of the task force, within 24 
available appropriations. 25 
(f) The task force shall: (1) Review the problem of illegal trafficking in 26 
firearms and its effects, including its effects on the public, and 27 
implement solutions to address the problem; (2) identify persons 28 
illegally trafficking in firearms and focus resources to prosecute such 29 
persons; (3) track firearms which were sold or distributed illegally and 30 
implement solutions to remove such firearms from persons illegally in 31 
possession of them; [and] (4) coordinate its activities with other law 32 
enforcement agencies within and without the state; and (5) not later than 33 
February 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, report in accordance with the 34 
provisions of section 11-4a to the Governor and the joint standing 35 
committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 36 
relating to the judiciary and public safety on: (A) The number of 37 
individuals identified and arrested pursuant to subdivision (2) of this 38 
subsection; (B) the number of firearms seized as a result of the task 39 
force's efforts pursuant to subdivision (3) of this subsection; and (C) any 40 
other activities of the task force during the preceding calendar year. 41 
Sec. 2. Section 29-31 of the general statutes is repealed and the 42 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2022): 43 
No sale of any pistol or revolver shall be made except in the room, 44 
store or place described in the permit for the sale of pistols and 45 
revolvers, and such permit or a copy thereof certified by the authority 46 
issuing the same shall be exposed to view within the room, store or place 47 
where pistols or revolvers are sold or offered or exposed for sale. No 48 
sale or delivery of any pistol or revolver shall be made unless the 49  Substitute Bill No. 16 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00016-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 5 
 
purchaser or person to whom the same is to be delivered is personally 50 
known to the vendor of such pistol or revolver or the person making 51 
delivery thereof or unless the person making such purchase or to whom 52 
delivery thereof is to be made provides evidence of his or her identity. 53 
The vendor of any pistol or revolver shall keep a record of each pistol or 54 
revolver sold in a book kept for that purpose, which record shall be in 55 
such form as is prescribed by 27 CFR 478.125. The vendor of any pistol 56 
or revolver shall make such record available for inspection upon the 57 
request of any sworn member of an organized local police department 58 
or the Division of State Police within the Department of Emergency 59 
Services and Public Protection or any investigator assigned to the state-60 
wide firearms [trafficking] crimes and tracing task force established 61 
under section 29-38e, as amended by this act. 62 
Sec. 3. Subsection (a) of section 29-38f of the general statutes is 63 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 64 
2022): 65 
(a) There shall be a State-Wide Firearms [trafficking] Crimes and 66 
Tracing Task Force Policy Board within the Division of State Police, 67 
within the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, for 68 
administrative purposes only, consisting of the Commissioner of 69 
Emergency Services and Public Protection, the Chief State's Attorney, 70 
the agent in Connecticut in charge of the federal Bureau of Alcohol, 71 
Tobacco and Firearms, the president of the Connecticut Police Chiefs 72 
Association and five chiefs of police designated by said association, each 73 
to serve for a term of one year, provided one such chief of police shall 74 
be from a municipality with a population of one hundred thousand or 75 
more. 76 
Sec. 4. (Effective from passage) The Commissioner of Emergency 77 
Services and Public Protection shall, in consultation with 78 
representatives of a national firearms industry trade association that 79 
advocates for safe enjoyment of recreational shooting and hunting, 80 
study the feasibility of creating a state license to sell firearms and, not 81 
later than December 31, 2022, report the findings of such study, in 82  Substitute Bill No. 16 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00016-
R01-SB.docx }   
4 of 5 
 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 83 
to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having 84 
cognizance of matters relating to judiciary and public safety. 85 
Sec. 5. (Effective from passage) The sum of one million two hundred 86 
fifty thousand dollars is allocated, in accordance with the provisions of 87 
special act 21-1, from the federal funds designated for the state pursuant 88 
to the provisions of section 602 of Subtitle M of Title IX of the American 89 
Rescue Plan Act of 2021, P.L. 117-2, as amended from time to time, to 90 
the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, for the 91 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, to fund a state-wide firearms crimes 92 
and tracing task force pursuant to section 29-38e of the general statutes, 93 
as amended by this act. 94 
Sec. 6. (Effective from passage) The sum of one million two hundred 95 
fifty thousand dollars is allocated, in accordance with the provisions of 96 
special act 21-1, from the federal funds designated for the state pursuant 97 
to the provisions of section 602 of Subtitle M of Title IX of the American 98 
Rescue Plan Act of 2021, P.L. 117-2, as amended from time to time, to 99 
the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, for the 100 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, to fund a state-wide firearms crimes 101 
and tracing task force pursuant to section 29-38e of the general statutes, 102 
as amended by this act. 103 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2022 29-38e 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2022 29-31 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2022 29-38f(a) 
Sec. 4 from passage New section 
Sec. 5 from passage New section 
Sec. 6 from passage New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
Sections 2 and 3 were added to make conforming changes for 
consistency. 
  Substitute Bill No. 16 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00016-
R01-SB.docx }   
5 of 5 
 
JUD Joint Favorable Subst.