Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Public Act 22-16
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
House Calendar Number 455
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4872
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
File Number 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 41
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|