Senate | 03/16/2022 | File Number 21 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 45 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |