Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00127 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/16/2022

                             
 
LCO 692   \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00127-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 127  
February Session, 2022 
LCO No. 692 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND 
DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING COMMUNITY INVESTMENT BOARDS AND 
NEIGHBORHOOD ASSISTANCE.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2022) (a) Except as provided in 1 
subsection (b) of this section, in each municipality with a population of 2 
more than sixty thousand, as enumerated in the 2020 federal decennial 3 
census, and having a total area of not more than thirty square miles, the 4 
chief executive officer of such municipality shall establish and appoint 5 
members to one community investment board for each neighborhood in 6 
the municipality. Each community investment board may be 7 
compromised of, but need not be limited to, residents, business owners, 8 
religious leaders, community development corporation representatives 9 
and community group representatives. Such boards shall identify 10 
priorities for the use of municipal revenue sharing grants awarded 11 
pursuant to section 4-66l of the general statutes, as amended by this act. 12 
(b) If any municipality described in subsection (a) of this section has 13 
established a neighborhood revitalization zone for a neighborhood 14  Raised Bill No. 127 
 
 
LCO 692  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00127-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
pursuant to section 7-600 of the general statutes, the chief executive 15 
officer of such municipality shall designate the neighborhood 16 
revitalization zone committee of such neighborhood, as described in 17 
section 7-602 of the general statutes, as the community investment board 18 
for such neighborhood for the purposes of carrying out the provisions 19 
of such subsection. 20 
Sec. 2. Section 4-66l of the general statutes is amended by adding 21 
subsection (h) as follows (Effective October 1, 2022): 22 
(NEW) (h) On and after October 1, 2022, any municipal revenue 23 
sharing grant awarded pursuant to this section to a municipality whose 24 
chief executive officer has established or designated community 25 
investment boards pursuant to section 1 of this act may be expended by 26 
such municipalities as follows: (1) Thirty-five per cent of such grant on 27 
priorities identified by such community investment boards, (2) thirty-28 
five per cent of such grant on priorities identified by the legislative body 29 
of the municipality, and (3) thirty per cent of such grant on priorities 30 
jointly agreed upon by such community investment boards and the 31 
legislative body of the municipality. 32 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) Not later than January 1, 2024, 33 
the Office of Policy and Management shall, within available 34 
appropriations, create and maintain an Internet web site to allow 35 
residents and organizations to submit proposals for solutions to 36 
problems specific to urban areas to the Office of Policy and 37 
Management. 38 
(b) If the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, or the 39 
secretary's designee, determines that a proposal submitted through the 40 
Internet web site created pursuant to subsection (a) of this subsection is 41 
viable, the secretary shall (1) identify a municipality or neighborhood in 42 
which to establish a pilot program to implement the proposal, (2) 43 
establish the pilot program in such municipality or neighborhood, (3) 44 
monitor the implementation of the pilot program, and (4) assess the 45 
results of the pilot program. 46  Raised Bill No. 127 
 
 
LCO 692  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00127-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
(c) The Office of Policy and Management shall, within available 47 
appropriations, provide a monetary award to each resident or 48 
organization that submits a proposal through the Internet web site 49 
created pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, if the secretary, or the 50 
secretary's designee, determines that a pilot program established to 51 
implement the proposal was successful after assessing the results of the 52 
pilot program pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. 53 
Sec. 4. (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) There is established a task force to 54 
study the (1) programs for which state funding is utilized by nonprofit 55 
providers, and (2) requirements imposed on nonprofit providers by 56 
state agencies and compliance with those requirements by nonprofit 57 
providers. 58 
(b) The task force shall consist of the following members: 59 
(1) Two appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives; 60 
(2) Two appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate; 61 
(3) Two appointed by the majority leader of the House of 62 
Representatives; 63 
(4) Two appointed by the majority leader of the Senate; 64 
(5) Two appointed by the minority leader of the House of 65 
Representatives; and 66 
(6) Two appointed by the minority leader of the Senate. 67 
(c) Any member of the task force appointed under subdivision (1), 68 
(2), (3), (4), (5) or (6) of subsection (b) of this section may be a member 69 
of the General Assembly. 70 
(d) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than 71 
thirty days after the effective date of this section. Any vacancy shall be 72 
filled by the appointing authority. 73  Raised Bill No. 127 
 
 
LCO 692  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00127-
R01-SB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
(e) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president pro 74 
tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the task force from 75 
among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall schedule 76 
the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not later than sixty 77 
days after the effective date of this section. 78 
(f) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the 79 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to planning 80 
and development shall serve as administrative staff of the task force. 81 
(g) Not later than January 1, 2023, the task force shall submit a report 82 
on its findings and any recommendations to the joint standing 83 
committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 84 
relating to planning and development, in accordance with the 85 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The task force shall 86 
terminate on the date that it submits such report or January 1, 2023, 87 
whichever is later. 88 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 2 October 1, 2022 4-66l 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2022 New section 
 
PD Joint Favorable