Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Public Act 22-46
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
House Calendar Number 503
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5672
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
File Number 645
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
File Number 398
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 280
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|