Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00215 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2022

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00215-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 2 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 215  
February Session, 2022 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ENGINEERING AND MAINTAINER POSITIONS 
AT THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) The Commissioner of 1 
Administrative Services, in consultation with the Commissioner of 2 
Transportation, shall recruit interns for the state's engineer intern job 3 
classification, as needed, for selection and appointment by the 4 
Department of Transportation. The Commissioners of Administrative 5 
Services and Transportation shall promote such recruitment at public 6 
and independent institutions of higher education. 7 
(b) On and after July 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, the 8 
Commissioner of Administrative Services shall increase the rate of 9 
compensation for the state's engineer intern job classification by the 10 
percentage increase, if any, in the national consumer price index for 11 
urban wage earners and clerical workers for the previous twelve-month 12 
period. 13 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2022) On and after July 1, 2022, and 14 
until June 30, 2025, (1) the Commissioner of Administrative Services 15 
shall place entry-level engineering and maintainer positions and level 16 
two maintainer positions at the Department of Transportation on 17 
continuous recruitment, and (2) not later than sixty days after a 18  Substitute Bill No. 215 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00215-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
candidate submits an application for such entry-level engineering or 19 
maintainer position or level two maintainer position, the Commissioner 20 
of Transportation shall either make an offer of employment to such 21 
candidate or reject the application of such candidate. 22 
Sec. 3. (Effective July 1, 2022) The sum of one hundred thousand 23 
dollars is appropriated to the Department of Administrative Services 24 
from the General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, for the 25 
recruitment of entry-level engineering positions at the Department of 26 
Transportation. 27 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2022 New section 
 
TRA Joint Favorable Subst.