Researcher: HP Page 1 4/26/22 OLR Bill Analysis sSB 215 AN ACT CONCERNING ENGINEERING AND MAINTAINER POSITIONS AT THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. SUMMARY This bill requires the Department of Administrative Services (DAS) commissioner and the Department of Transportation (DOT) commissioner to take certain actions related to recruiting engineers, engineer interns, and maintainers, within available resources. The bill requires the DAS commissioner, in consultation with the DOT commissioner, to recruit interns, as needed, for the state’s engineer intern job classification for selection and appointment to DOT. Both commissioners must promote recruitment at public and independent institutions of higher education. Starting July 1, 2023, the bill also requires the DAS commissioner to annually increase the pay rate for this job classification by any percent increase in the national consumer price index for urban wage earners and clerical workers for the previous 12- month period. From July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2025, the bill requires the DAS commissioner to place entry-level engineering and maintainer positions and level two maintainer positions on continuous recruitment. It also requires that DOT either make an employment offer or reject a candidate within 60 days after receiving a candidate’s application for these positions. EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022 BACKGROUND Legislative History The Senate referred the bill (File 398) to the Appropriations Committee which reported a substitute eliminating the appropriation 2022SB-00215-R010645-BA.DOCX Researcher: HP Page 2 4/26/22 for engineer recruitment and adding provisions stating the bill’s recruitment and wage requirements must be implemented within available resources. COMMITTEE ACTION Transportation Committee Joint Favorable Substitute Yea 35 Nay 0 (03/24/2022) Appropriations Committee Joint Favorable Substitute Yea 48 Nay 0 (04/18/2022)