Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00215 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/28/2022

                     
Researcher: HP 	Page 1 	4/28/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 215 (File 645, as amended by Senate "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ENGINEERING AND MAINTAINER 
POSITIONS AT THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Administrative Services (DAS) 
commissioner and the Department of Transportation (DOT) 
commissioner to take certain actions related to recruiting and hiring 
engineers, engineer interns, and maintainers.  
The bill requires the DAS commissioner to recruit interns for the 
summer worker professional engineer job classification for DOT when 
the DOT commissioner requests she do so. Both commissioners must 
promote recruitment at public and independent institutions of higher 
education. Starting July 1, 2023, the bill also requires the DAS 
commissioner to annually increase the pay rate for this job classification 
by any percentage increase in the national consumer price index for 
urban wage earners and clerical workers for the previous 12-month 
period.  
From July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2025, the bill requires the DAS 
commissioner to engage in the ongoing successive recruitment of entry-
level engineering and maintainer one positions and transportation 
maintainer two positions on DOT’s behalf. It also requires DOT to (1) 
establish the duration of the application period for each recruitment and 
(2) make an employment offer or reject a candidate within 120 days after 
receiving a candidate’s application for these positions.  
Lastly, the bill allows the DOT commissioner to consider a 
candidate’s application for another open position at the department 
without requiring the candidate to submit another application, as long 
as the candidate meets the minimum experience and training 
qualifications.   2022SB-00215-R02-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 2 	4/28/22 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022 
*Senate Amendment “A” (1) requires DAS to engage in ongoing 
successive recruitment of engineers and maintainers, rather than place 
the positions on continuous recruitment as the underlying bill required; 
(2) removes requirements that the bill’s recruitment and wage 
provisions be implemented within available resources, (3) gives DOT 
120 days, rather than 60 days, after a candidate’s application to make an 
offer to or reject the candidate; (4) allows the DOT commissioner to 
consider a candidate for another open position; and (5) makes other 
minor changes and technical corrections. 
BACKGROUND 
Legislative History 
The Senate referred the bill (File 398) to the Appropriations 
Committee, which reported a substitute eliminating the appropriation 
for engineer recruitment and adding provisions stating the bill’s 
recruitment and wage requirements must be implemented within 
available resources. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Transportation Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 35 Nay 0 (03/24/2022) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 48 Nay 0 (04/18/2022)