Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00286 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 4, 2022
Fiscal Note May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 27, 2022
Analysis May 4, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022
Analysis March 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 19, 2022