Senate | 04/19/2022 | File Number 519 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 382 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |