Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00308 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note March 28, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 19, 2022
Analysis May 3, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022
Analysis March 28, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 16, 2022