Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Fiscal Note April 5, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 3, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022
Analysis April 5, 2022
Bill April 5, 2022