Senate | 04/25/2022 | File Number 617 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 445 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Public Hearing 03/21 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |