House
|
05/24/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Special Act 22-20
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
House Calendar Number 553
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6047
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
File Number 543
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 399
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|