Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00464 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 2, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022
Analysis April 20, 2022