Senate | 05/27/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Special Act 22-16 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2022 | House Calendar Number 538 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | File Number 656 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 469 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Public Hearing 04/12 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |