Senate | 04/25/2022 | File Number 626 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 454 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Filed with Senate Clerks |