House
|
06/29/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Public Act 23-163
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 601
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7160
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
File Number 125
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Calendar Number 97
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|