Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 14, 2023
Analysis June 3, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 21, 2023