House | 06/13/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Public Act 23-48 | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | File Number 845 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 575 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8976 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | File Number 52 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Calendar Number 56 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Public Hearing 02/02 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |