Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05781 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 1, 2023
Fiscal Note May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 14, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 28, 2023
Analysis June 1, 2023
Analysis May 31, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 6, 2023