Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 597
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9388
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
File Number 305
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Calendar Number 203
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|