Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2023
Fiscal Note June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 3, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023