Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06397 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/03/2023

                     
Researcher: KLM 	Page 1 	6/3/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6397 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ZERO -CARBON EMISSIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill states that Connecticut declares a climate crisis to (1) show 
the urgency for enacting meaningful climate legislation and (2) support 
increased efforts to secure federal funds to respond to the crisis.  
The bill requires the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection (DEEP) commissioner, by January 1, 2025, and within 
available appropriations, to produce a comprehensive Connecticut 
Decarbonization Roadmap identifying the regulations, policies, and 
programs needed to meet the state’s greenhouse gas (GHG) emissions 
reduction targets (see BACKGROUND). The commissioner must 
convene stakeholder meetings when developing the roadmap.  
Under the bill, after the decarbonization roadmap is completed, the 
commissioner must submit it to the Environment Committee. The 
roadmap is implemented if both chambers approve it. However, the bill 
specifies that a decision not to approve it does not affect any state 
agency’s ability to implement an action that is otherwise within its 
authority. 
*House Amendment “A” replaces the underlying bill, which 
declared a climate emergency and imposed requirements on various 
state agencies to address it, including one for DEEP to produce a 
decarbonization roadmap. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage 
CLIMATE CRISIS DECLARATION 
The bill states that Connecticut recognizes the need and urgency to 
mitigate climate impacts and prepare for and manage disaster risk from  2023HB-06397-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 2 	6/3/23 
 
climate change. It states that the climate crisis threatens (1) the resilience 
of communities in the state, regardless of zip code; (2) multiple aspects 
of the state’s natural resources and infrastructure assets; (3) the state’s 
economy; and (4) the quality of life for the state’s younger generations.  
The bill states that it is thusly urgent to (1) significantly and rapidly 
decrease GHG emissions and (2) increase community coping capacities 
to handle climate change impacts. It also specifies that this declaration 
does not authorize the governor to operate the state through executive 
order. 
DECARBONIZATION ROAD MAP 
Content 
Under the bill, the decarbonization roadmap must at least identify 
the following: 
1. interim and sector-specific targets to help in the planning 
process, which the DEEP commissioner must (a) review at least 
every five years and (b) update as needed to meet the GHG 
emissions reduction targets; 
2. available federal funds to help local businesses, schools, and 
municipalities reduce carbon emissions; 
3. estimated carbon emissions reductions of proposed policies, 
including the proportion of necessary reductions that each 
recommended policy achieves; 
4. a timeline for implementing the recommended actions; 
5. each entity responsible for implementing the policy; and 
6. the estimated net value of the benefits of implementing the 
proposed policies, including the energy cost savings and 
economic benefits. 
The bill requires the roadmap to (1) ensure the state meets the Global 
Warming Solutions Act’s relevant timelines and deadlines and (2) 
include tangible actions to meet the GHG emissions reduction targets  2023HB-06397-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 3 	6/3/23 
 
(see BACKGROUND). It allows the roadmap to include any information 
and recommendations from existing planning materials relevant to 
achieving the reduction targets such as the following: the Governor’s 
Council on Climate Change reports and the state’s Comprehensive 
Energy Strategy, GHG Emissions Inventory Report, and Integrated 
Resources Plan. 
Stakeholder Meetings 
The bill requires the DEEP commissioner to convene stakeholder 
meetings involving potentially impacted parties when developing the 
decarbonization roadmap. The meetings must at least include 
representatives from the following entities: 
1. utilities and municipal utilities; 
2. residential, commercial, and industrial heating and cooling 
companies, as well as industrial and manufacturing and natural 
gas distribution and service companies; 
3. air transportation providers, bus transportation services and 
companies, transportation and home-heating fuels services, and 
trucking and rail service companies; 
4. solid waste and recycling providers; 
5. realtors and commercial and residential builders; 
6. waste-to-energy and nuclear generating facilities;  
7. statewide business organizations; 
8. municipalities; 
9. schools and places of higher education; 
10. environmental groups and natural and working lands 
organizations; and 
11. Connecticut residents.  2023HB-06397-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 4 	6/3/23 
 
BACKGROUND 
GHG Emissions Reduction Targets 
By law, the Global Warming Solutions Act requires the state to reduce 
GHG emissions from all sources to a level at least (1) 10% below 1990 
emission levels by January 1, 2020; (2) 45% below 2001 emission levels 
by January 1, 2030; and (3) 80% below 2001 emission levels by January 
1, 2050. It also requires the state to reduce GHG emissions from 
electricity supplied to electric customers in the state to 0% by January 1, 
2040. Every three years, the DEEP commissioner must report to the 
Environment, Energy and Technology, and Transportation committees 
on the quantifiable reductions achieved to meet the GHG emission 
reduction targets (CGS § 22a-200a).  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 26 Nay 7 (03/10/2023) 
 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 12 Nay 6 (04/19/2023)