Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06397 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/29/2023

                     
Researcher: KLM 	Page 1 	3/29/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6397  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ZERO -CARBON EMISSIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill states that Connecticut declares climate change a public 
health and environmental justice emergency for purposes of increasing 
access to federal funds and showing the urgency of enacting 
meaningful, which the bill does not define, climate legislation.  
Relatedly, the bill requires Connecticut, through its governor and 
other statewide elected officials, to increase federal funding requests for 
climate emergency-related actions. Specifically, the state must seek the 
funds for (1) statewide affordable zero-carbon electricity generation (i.e., 
solar, wind, geothermal, and battery storage), (2) community climate 
resilience, (3) environmental justice opportunities, and (4) training for 
clean energy sector jobs and fossil fuel-to-clean-energy business 
transitions. (The bill does not specify which officials are responsible for 
which requests and, presumably, these requests may be delegated to 
executive branch agencies.) 
The bill creates several requirements for the following state agencies 
to address the climate emergency: administrative services (DAS), 
economic and community development (DECD), energy and 
environmental protection (DEEP), the Public Utilities Regulatory 
Authority (PURA), and the Office of Workforce Strategy (OWS). 
The bill states that its climate emergency declaration does not 
authorize the governor to operate the state through executive order. It 
also states that the bill serves to invoke the National Emergencies Act 
for the President of the United States to declare a related national 
emergency (see COMMENT).  
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage  2023HB-06397-R000305-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 2 	3/29/23 
 
CLIMATE EMERGENCY DE CLARATION 
The bill states that the climate emergency threatens the resilience 
(and the existence of some communities in the state), including aspects 
of the state’s environment, economy, and quality of life for the state’s 
younger generations. The bill also states that it is urgent to (1) greatly 
and quickly increase community coping capacities to handle climate 
extremes and climate refugees and (2) mitigate climate impacts and 
prepare for and manage disaster risk from climate extremes. 
STATE AGENCY REQUIRE MENTS 
DEEP 
The bill requires the DEEP commissioner to: 
1. by July 1, 2025, and within available appropriations, produce a 
comprehensive Connecticut Decarbonization Roadmap to 
achieve the state’s greenhouse gas (GHG) emissions reduction 
targets (by law, DEEP already reports on its GHG emissions 
reduction every three years, see BACKGROUND) and 
2. establish a Citizens Oversight Working Group to (a) give the 
public oversight of the state’s adherence to its GHG emissions 
reduction targets, (b) ensure that the state meets the targets’ 
timelines and deadlines and help develop tangible actions to 
meet the targets, (c) meet the Connecticut Integrated Resource 
Plan’s goal of a fully zero-carbon electric sector by 2040, and (d) 
ensure Connecticut complies with all climate change executive 
orders (it is unclear if the working group has the authority and 
means to fulfill these requirements). 
Under the bill, DEEP must also take unspecified actions to acquire 
federal funds to develop programs for local communities throughout 
Connecticut, including underserved communities, which the bill does 
not define. These required actions must mitigate impacts of climate 
change, fossil fuel use, waste disposal incineration, landfills, and other 
municipal functions that historically disproportionately effect 
underserved communities.  2023HB-06397-R000305-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 3 	3/29/23 
 
DEEP and DAS 
The bill requires DEEP and DAS to help Connecticut residents and 
municipalities obtain federal funds to install renewable energy, zero-
carbon emissions clean all-electric energy systems in all newly 
constructed residential and commercial buildings. These efforts must 
include behind-the-meter grid-adapted solar and wind systems and 
battery storage systems. The departments must work with energy 
supply companies to develop equitable cost-favorable clean energy 
solutions for retail end users. 
DEEP and PURA 
The bill requires DEEP and PURA to (1) develop strategies for energy 
infrastructure development that focus on renewable energy systems 
(e.g., battery storage) and (2) work with northeastern states and regional 
independent system operators to implement the strategies. 
DECD 
The bill requires DECD to collaborate with municipal economic 
development agencies in the state to secure federal funding for local 
businesses to access renewable energy supplies and consume less fossil 
fuel. 
DECD and OWS 
The bill requires DECD and OWS, by October 1, 2023, to (1) work 
with all industries in the state that are impacted by the transition away 
from fossil fuel use and (2) develop job retaining plans for them. 
COMMENT 
National Emergencies Act 
The federal National Emergencies Act (NEA) (P.L. 94-412) allows 
presidents to issue formal declarations of a national emergency and 
Congress to oppose and end a declaration. The bill states that its climate 
emergency declaration serves to invoke the NEA, but the NEA does not 
give states the power to do this. Emergencies declared under the NEA 
are exclusively federal actions. 
BACKGROUND  2023HB-06397-R000305-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 4 	3/29/23 
 
GHG Emissions Reduction Targets 
By law, the Global Warming Solutions Act requires the state to reduce 
GHG emissions from all sources to a level at least (1) 10% below 1990 
emission levels by January 1, 2020; (2) 45% below 2001 emission levels 
by January 1, 2030; and (3) 80% below 2001 emission levels by January 
1, 2050. It also requires the state to reduce GHG emissions from 
electricity supplied to electric customers in the state to 0% by January 1, 
2040. Every three years, the DEEP commissioner must report to the 
Environment, Energy and Technology, and Transportation committees 
on the quantifiable reductions achieved to meet the GHG emission 
reduction targets (CGS § 22a-200a).  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 30 Nay 3 (03/10/2023)