House | 06/07/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Public Act 23-6 | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 401 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | File Number 25 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Calendar Number 41 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Public Hearing 01/30 | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |