House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |