Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06580 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/06/2023

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	6/6/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6580 (File 354, as amended by House “A”)* 
 
AN ACT REVISING CERTAIN CERTIFICATION REQUIREMENTS 
RELATED TO SMOKE AND CARBON MONOXIDE DETECTORS IN 
RESIDENTIAL BUILDINGS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes several changes in a smoke and carbon monoxide 
detector disclosure law for residential buildings.  
Under current law, the transferor (e.g., seller) of a one- or two-family 
residence must generally give the transferee (e.g., buyer) an affidavit 
certifying certain conditions about the detectors or credit the transferee 
with $250 at the closing. The bill eliminates the credit option and extends 
the affidavit requirement to transfers of units in residential common 
interest communities. (The law already applies to common interest 
community residential units located in single-family buildings and 
duplexes; the bill’s extension presumably applies to units in buildings 
designed to be occupied by more than two families.)  
The bill changes the content required in the affidavit and when it 
must be given. It also expands the exemptions from the law’s 
requirements by exempting transfers of property acquired by a 
judgment of strict foreclosure or by foreclosure by sale.  
Additionally, the bill requires the State Fire Marshal’s Office to create 
a (1) model form that may be used for the affidavit and (2) guide 
outlining smoke detector requirements to help transferors complete the 
affidavit. The office must consult with an association representing fire 
marshals’ interests for the model form and guide, as well as with a bar 
association and an association representing realtors’ interests for the 
model form. 
*House Amendment “A” principally (1) extends the affidavit 
requirement to every unit in a residential common interest community  2023HB-06580-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	6/6/23 
 
regardless of occupancy design, (2) removes the underlying bill’s 
requirement for a compliance form instead of an affidavit, (3) requires 
the State Fire Marshal’s Office to create the model form and guide, (4) 
eliminates a process for when a transferred property lacks the 
satisfactory detectors or has inoperable ones, and (5) expands the 
exemptions from the law’s requirements.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023  
AFFIDAVIT CHANGES 
Under current law, the affidavit must be given before transferring 
title and certify that the residence: 
1. has smoke detection and warning equipment (i.e., smoke 
detectors) that satisfy specified conditions in the law, the Fire 
Safety Code, the State Fire Prevention Code, and the State 
Building Code; and 
2. either (a) has carbon monoxide detection and warning 
equipment (i.e., carbon monoxide detectors) that satisfy the law’s 
conditions or (b) does not pose a risk of carbon monoxide 
poisoning because it does not have a fuel-burning appliance, 
fireplace, or attached garage. 
The bill instead requires it to be (1) given at the time of the 
transaction’s closing and (2) signed and dated by the transferor. It also 
requires the transferor to state, rather than certify, that the equipment 
satisfies the law’s conditions, except the bill changes several of them, 
eliminating the requirement that the smoke detectors satisfy the above 
fire and building codes, and requiring specific disclosures about any 
smoke detectors (see below). By law, nothing in the affidavit constitutes 
a warranty beyond the transfer of title. 
SMOKE DETECTOR CONDI TIONS 
Under current law, the residence’s smoke detectors must be: 
1. able to sense visible or invisible smoke particles; 
2. installed following the manufacturer’s instructions and in the 
immediate vicinity of each bedroom;  2023HB-06580-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 3 	6/6/23 
 
3. able to give an alarm suitable to warn occupants when activated; 
4. powered by the household electrical service, unless the residence 
was issued a new occupancy building permit before October 1, 
1976 (in which case, it may have battery-operated detectors);  
5. for residences issued a new occupancy building permit on or 
after October 16, 1989, interconnected so that activating one 
smoke detector alarm causes all the alarms for all detectors to 
activate; and  
6. for residences issued a new occupancy building permit on or 
after May 1, 1999, in all sleeping areas. 
Under the bill, the residence’s smoke detectors must be installed in 
or in the immediate vicinity of each bedroom and produce an audible 
alarm when the equipment’s test button is depressed. 
SMOKE DETECTOR DISCL OSURES 
Under the bill, affidavits must specify, if applicable and to the best of 
the transferor’s knowledge, whether the smoke detectors: 
1. are battery powered or powered by the household electrical 
service;  
2. are in or in the immediate vicinity of each bedroom; 
3. are interconnected in a way that the alarm activation on any 
detector in the residence or unit causes the alarms on all the 
residence’s or unit’s detectors to activate; and 
4. have the following statement: “State law requires that all 
properties have operable smoke and carbon monoxide detection 
and warning equipment. This law is to save lives—your life, and 
the lives of your family members and your pets—as well as to 
protect your property.”. 
However, for any residence or unit built before January 1, 1990, the 
bill allows a transferor to specify on the affidavit that the conditions 
about interconnectivity are not applicable to the residence or unit.  2023HB-06580-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 4 	6/6/23 
 
CARBON MONOXIDE DETE CTOR CONDITIONS 
Under current law, the carbon monoxide detectors must be able to (1) 
sense the amount of carbon monoxide present in parts per million and 
(2) give an alarm suitable to warn occupants when activated. It also 
requires them to be installed according to the manufacturer’s 
instructions. The bill instead requires them to produce an audible alarm 
when the detectors’ test buttons are depressed. By law, unchanged by 
the bill, the detectors may be battery-operated. 
EXEMPTIONS  
Existing law exempts transferors from the affidavit requirements 
during the following transfers: 
1. from one co-owner to another or to the transferor’s spouse, 
parent, sibling, child, grandparent, or grandchild where no 
consideration is paid; 
2. under a court order or by executors, administrators, trustees, or 
conservators; 
3. by the federal government or any of its political subdivisions; 
4. by deed in lieu of foreclosure; 
5. involving refinancing of an existing mortgage debt; or 
6. by mortgage deed or other instrument to secure a debt where the 
transferor’s title to the property is subject to a preexisting 
mortgage debt. 
The bill expands this exemption by exempting properties transferred 
through a judgement of strict foreclosure or by foreclosure by sale. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 25 Nay 0 (03/16/2023)