Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06580 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/21/2023

                             
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 6580 
 
Public Act No. 23-164 
 
 
AN ACT REVISING REQUIREMENTS FOR THE AFFIDAVIT 
RELATED TO SMOKE AND CARBON MONOXIDE DETECTORS IN 
RESIDENTIAL BUILDINGS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 29-453 of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2023): 
(a) [Prior to transferring title to] At the time of closing on a transaction 
involving any real property containing a residential building designed 
to be occupied by one or two families or containing a unit in a residential 
common interest community, the transferor of such real property shall 
present to the transferee an affidavit [certifying] stating (1) that such 
residential building or unit is equipped with smoke detection and 
warning equipment complying with this section, [the Fire Safety Code, 
the State Fire Prevention Code and the State Building Code,] and (2) that 
such residential building or unit is equipped with carbon monoxide 
detection and warning equipment complying with this section or does 
not pose a risk of carbon monoxide poisoning because such residential 
building or unit does not contain a fuel-burning appliance, fireplace or 
attached garage. Nothing in the affidavit shall constitute a warranty 
beyond the transfer of title. The affidavit shall be signed and dated by 
the transferor.  Substitute House Bill No. 6580 
 
Public Act No. 23-164 	2 of 4 
 
[(b) Any transferor who fails to comply with the provisions of 
subsection (a) of this section shall credit the transferee with the sum of 
two hundred fifty dollars at closing.] 
[(c)] (b) Any smoke detection and warning equipment required 
pursuant to subsection (a) of this section shall: [be: 
(1) Capable of sensing visible or invisible smoke particles; 
(2) Installed in accordance with the manufacturer's instructions and 
in the immediate vicinity of each bedroom; 
(3) Capable of providing an alarm suitable to warn occupants when 
such equipment is activated; 
(4) Powered by the household electrical service, except such 
equipment may be battery powered in a residential building for which 
a building permit for new occupancy was issued prior to October 1, 
1976; 
(5) In a residential building for which a building permit for new 
occupancy was issued on or after October 16, 1989, interconnected in 
such a manner that the activation of the alarm on any smoke detection 
and warning equipment in the residential building causes the alarm on 
all smoke detection and warning equipment in such building to activate; 
and 
(6) In a residential building for which a building permit for new 
occupancy was issued on or after May 1, 1999, located in all sleeping 
areas.] 
(1) Be installed in or in the immediate vicinity of each bedroom; and 
(2) Produce an audible alarm when the equipment's test button is 
depressed.  Substitute House Bill No. 6580 
 
Public Act No. 23-164 	3 of 4 
 
(c) The affidavit required by subsection (a) of this section shall 
specify, if applicable, to the best of the transferor's knowledge whether 
the smoke detection and warning equipment: 
(1) Is battery powered; 
(2) Is located in or in the immediate vicinity of each bedroom; 
(3) Is powered by the household electrical service; 
(4) Is interconnected in such a manner that activation of the alarm on 
any such equipment in the residential building or unit causes the alarm 
on all such equipment in the building or unit to activate, provided that 
for any residential building or unit constructed prior to January 1, 1990, 
a transferor may specify on the affidavit that the conditions requiring 
such equipment to be interconnected are not applicable to the building 
or unit; and 
(5) Contains the following statement: "State law requires that all 
properties have operable smoke and carbon monoxide detection and 
warning equipment. This law is to save lives—your life, and the lives of 
your family members and your pets—as well as to protect your 
property.". 
(d) The Office of the State Fire Marshal shall (1) in consultation with 
an association representing the interests of realtors, a bar association 
and an association representing the interests of fire marshals, develop a 
model form that may be used for the affidavit required by subsection (a) 
of this section, and (2) in consultation with an association representing 
the interests of fire marshals, develop a guide outlining smoke detection 
and warning equipment requirements to assist transferors with the 
completion of such affidavit. 
[(d)] (e) Any carbon monoxide detection and warning equipment 
required pursuant to subsection (a) of this section [shall be (1) capable  Substitute House Bill No. 6580 
 
Public Act No. 23-164 	4 of 4 
 
of sensing carbon monoxide present in parts per million, (2) installed in 
accordance with the manufacturer's instructions, and (3) capable of 
providing an alarm suitable to warn occupants when such equipment is 
activated. Such equipment] may be operated using batteries and shall 
produce an audible alarm when the equipment's test button is 
depressed. 
[(e)] (f) The following shall be exempt from the requirements of 
[subsections (a) and (b) of] this section: (1) Any transfer from one or 
more coowners solely to one or more of the other coowners; (2) transfers 
made to the spouse, mother, father, brother, sister, child, grandparent 
or grandchild of the transferor where no consideration is paid; (3) 
transfers pursuant to an order of the court; (4) transfers by the federal 
government or any political subdivision thereof; (5) transfers by deed in 
lieu of foreclosure; (6) any transfer of title incident to the refinancing of 
an existing debt secured by a mortgage; (7) transfers by mortgage deed 
or other instrument to secure a debt where the transferor's title to the 
real property being transferred is subject to a preexisting debt secured 
by a mortgage; [and] (8) transfers made by executors, administrators, 
trustees or conservators; and (9) any transfer of property acquired by a 
judgment of strict foreclosure or by foreclosure by sale.