LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06580
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06580
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2023 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06580
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 6, 2023
Fiscal Note
June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 3, 2023
Bill
January 31, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
August 16, 2023
Analysis
June 6, 2023
Bill
April 3, 2023
Compare
Analysis
April 3, 2023
Chaptered
Bill
June 21, 2023
Compare