Senate | 05/11/2023 | File Number 759 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 486 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 7616 | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7610 | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7314 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | File Number 162 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Calendar Number 128 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |