Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023