House | 06/26/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Public Act 23-59 | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 543 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | File Number 272 | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House Calendar Number 181 | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |