Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06622 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/12/2023

                             
 
 
House Bill No. 6622 
 
Public Act No. 23-59 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CERTIFICATION OR ACCREDITATION 
REQUIREMENT DEADLINES FOR A LAW ENFORCEMENT UNIT 
THAT SERVES A MUNICIPALITY AND CONSISTS SOLELY OF 
CONSTABLES OR RESIDENT STATE TROOPERS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 7-294ee of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 
(a) The Police Officer Standards and Training Council, established 
under section 7-294b, and the Commissioner of Emergency Services and 
Public Protection or the commissioner's designee, shall jointly develop, 
adopt and revise, as necessary, minimum standards and practices for 
the administration, management and operation of law enforcement 
units, as defined in section 7-294a. Such minimum standards and 
practices shall be based upon standards established by the International 
Association of Chiefs of Police and the Commission on Accreditation for 
Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., and shall include, but need not be 
limited to, standards and practices regarding bias-based policing, use of 
force, response to crimes of family violence, use of body-worn recording 
equipment, complaints that allege misconduct by police officers, use of 
electronic defense weapons, eyewitness identification procedures, 
notifications in death and related events and pursuits by police officers  House Bill No. 6622 
 
Public Act No. 23-59 	2 of 4 
 
and compliance with the guidance issued by the council pursuant to 
subdivision (1) of subsection (g) of section 7-294d regarding reporting 
procedures to be followed by chief law enforcement officers for 
certificate suspension, cancellation or revocation. Not later than January 
1, 2023, the council shall, within available appropriations, divide the 
minimum standards and practices into three state-accreditation tiers, to 
be known as tier one, tier two and tier three. Tier one shall consist of 
minimum standards and practices designed to protect law enforcement 
units from liability, enhance the delivery of services and improve public 
confidence in law enforcement units. Tier two shall consist of minimum 
standards and practices for the administration, management and 
operation of law enforcement units. Tier three shall consist of higher 
minimum standards and practices for the administration, management 
and operation of law enforcement units. The council shall post the 
minimum standards and practices of each tier on the council's Internet 
web site and disseminate the minimum standards and practices of each 
tier to law enforcement units. The council and commissioner or the 
commissioner's designee shall jointly develop a process to review a law 
enforcement unit's compliance with the minimum standards and 
practices of each tier and issue a certificate of compliance with the 
minimum standards and practices of tier one, tier two or tier three, as 
the case may be, to a law enforcement unit that meets or exceeds the 
minimum standards and practices of such tier. 
(b) On and after January 1, 2019, and until December 31, 2022, each 
law enforcement unit shall adopt and maintain (1) the minimum 
standards and practices developed by the council pursuant to 
subsection (a) of this section, or (2) a higher level of accreditation 
standards developed by the council or the Commission on Accreditation 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law enforcement unit that 
serves a municipality and consists solely of constables or resident state 
troopers shall adopt and maintain such standards and practices or 
accreditation on and after January 1, 2019, and until December 31, 2023.  House Bill No. 6622 
 
Public Act No. 23-59 	3 of 4 
 
(c) On and after January 1, 2023, and until December 31, 2023, each 
law enforcement unit shall (1) be certified, at a minimum, as meeting the 
requirements for state-accreditation tier one developed by the council 
pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) meet a higher level of 
accreditation standards developed by the Commission on Accreditation 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law enforcement unit that 
serves a municipality and consists solely of constables or resident state 
troopers shall be so certified or meet such accreditation standards on 
and after January 1, 2024, and until December 31, 2024. 
(d) On and after January 1, 2024, and until December 31, 2025, each 
law enforcement unit shall (1) be certified, at a minimum, as meeting the 
requirements for state-accreditation tiers one and two developed by the 
council pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) meet a higher 
level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission on 
Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law 
enforcement unit that serves a municipality and consists solely of 
constables or resident state troopers shall be so certified or meet such 
accreditation standards on and after January 1, 2025, and until 
December 31, 2026. 
(e) On and after January 1, 2026, each law enforcement unit shall (1) 
be certified as meeting the requirements for state-accreditation tiers one, 
two and three developed by the council pursuant to subsection (a) of 
this section, or (2) meet a higher level of accreditation standards 
developed by the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 
Agencies, Inc., except a law enforcement unit that serves a municipality 
and consists solely of constables or resident state troopers shall be so 
certified or meet such accreditation standards on and after January 1, 
2027. 
(f) If a law enforcement unit fails to obtain or maintain the 
appropriate certification for a state-accreditation tier or tiers or the 
higher level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission  House Bill No. 6622 
 
Public Act No. 23-59 	4 of 4 
 
on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., as required by the 
provisions of subsections (b) to (e), inclusive, of this section, the council 
shall work with the law enforcement unit to obtain and maintain such 
certification or accreditation standards. 
(g) If a law enforcement unit fails to comply with the guidance issued 
by the council pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (g) of section 7-
294d regarding reporting procedures to be followed by chief law 
enforcement officers for certificate suspension, cancellation or 
revocation, the council may revoke the certificate of compliance with the 
appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers, as the case may be, issued 
pursuant to this section. 
(h) No civil action may be brought against a law enforcement unit for 
damages arising from the failure of the law enforcement unit to (1) 
adopt and maintain such minimum standards and practices or a higher 
level of accreditation standards pursuant to subsection (b) of this 
section, or (2) obtain and maintain the appropriate certificate of 
compliance with the appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers or 
accreditation by the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 
Agencies, Inc., as required by subsections (c) to (e), inclusive, of this 
section.