Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06622 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                       
 
LCO No. 3946  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6622  
January Session, 2023 
LCO No. 3946 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC SAFETY AND SECURITY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CERTIFICATION OR ACCREDITATION 
REQUIREMENT DEADLINES FOR A LAW ENFORCEMENT UNIT THAT 
SERVES A MUNICIPALITY AND CONSISTS SOLELY OF 
CONSTABLES OR RESIDENT STATE TROOPERS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 7-294ee of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 
(a) The Police Officer Standards and Training Council, established 3 
under section 7-294b, and the Commissioner of Emergency Services and 4 
Public Protection or the commissioner's designee, shall jointly develop, 5 
adopt and revise, as necessary, minimum standards and practices for 6 
the administration, management and operation of law enforcement 7 
units, as defined in section 7-294a. Such minimum standards and 8 
practices shall be based upon standards established by the International 9 
Association of Chiefs of Police and the Commission on Accreditation for 10 
Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., and shall include, but need not be 11 
limited to, standards and practices regarding bias-based policing, use of 12 
force, response to crimes of family violence, use of body-worn recording 13 
equipment, complaints that allege misconduct by police officers, use of 14  Raised Bill No.  6622 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3946   	2 of 4 
 
electronic defense weapons, eyewitness identification procedures, 15 
notifications in death and related events and pursuits by police officers 16 
and compliance with the guidance issued by the council pursuant to 17 
subdivision (1) of subsection (g) of section 7-294d regarding reporting 18 
procedures to be followed by chief law enforcement officers for 19 
certificate suspension, cancellation or revocation. Not later than January 20 
1, 2023, the council shall, within available appropriations, divide the 21 
minimum standards and practices into three state-accreditation tiers, to 22 
be known as tier one, tier two and tier three. Tier one shall consist of 23 
minimum standards and practices designed to protect law enforcement 24 
units from liability, enhance the delivery of services and improve public 25 
confidence in law enforcement units. Tier two shall consist of minimum 26 
standards and practices for the administration, management and 27 
operation of law enforcement units. Tier three shall consist of higher 28 
minimum standards and practices for the administration, management 29 
and operation of law enforcement units. The council shall post the 30 
minimum standards and practices of each tier on the council's Internet 31 
web site and disseminate the minimum standards and practices of each 32 
tier to law enforcement units. The council and commissioner or the 33 
commissioner's designee shall jointly develop a process to review a law 34 
enforcement unit's compliance with the minimum standards and 35 
practices of each tier and issue a certificate of compliance with the 36 
minimum standards and practices of tier one, tier two or tier three, as 37 
the case may be, to a law enforcement unit that meets or exceeds the 38 
minimum standards and practices of such tier. 39 
(b) On and after January 1, 2019, and until December 31, 2022, each 40 
law enforcement unit shall adopt and maintain (1) the minimum 41 
standards and practices developed by the council pursuant to 42 
subsection (a) of this section, or (2) a higher level of accreditation 43 
standards developed by the council or the Commission on Accreditation 44 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law enforcement unit that 45 
serves a municipality and consists solely of constables or resident state 46 
troopers shall adopt and maintain such standards and practices or 47 
accreditation on and after January 1, 2019, and until December 31, 2023. 48  Raised Bill No.  6622 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3946   	3 of 4 
 
(c) On and after January 1, 2023, and until December 31, 2023, each 49 
law enforcement unit shall (1) be certified, at a minimum, as meeting the 50 
requirements for state-accreditation tier one developed by the council 51 
pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) meet a higher level of 52 
accreditation standards developed by the Commission on Accreditation 53 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law enforcement unit that 54 
serves a municipality and consists solely of constables or resident state 55 
troopers shall be so certified or meet such accreditation standards on 56 
and after January 1, 2024, and until December 31, 2024. 57 
(d) On and after January 1, 2024, and until December 31, 2025, each 58 
law enforcement unit shall (1) be certified, at a minimum, as meeting the 59 
requirements for state-accreditation tiers one and two developed by the 60 
council pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) meet a higher 61 
level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission on 62 
Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law 63 
enforcement unit that serves a municipality and consists solely of 64 
constables or resident state troopers shall be so certified or meet such 65 
accreditation standards on and after January 1, 2025, and until 66 
December 31, 2026. 67 
(e) On and after January 1, 2026, each law enforcement unit shall (1) 68 
be certified as meeting the requirements for state-accreditation tiers one, 69 
two and three developed by the council pursuant to subsection (a) of 70 
this section, or (2) meet a higher level of accreditation standards 71 
developed by the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 72 
Agencies, Inc., except a law enforcement unit that serves a municipality 73 
and consists solely of constables or resident state troopers shall be so 74 
certified or meet such accreditation standards on and after January 1, 75 
2027. 76 
(f) If a law enforcement unit fails to obtain or maintain the 77 
appropriate certification for a state-accreditation tier or tiers or the 78 
higher level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission 79 
on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., as required by the 80 
provisions of subsections (b) to (e), inclusive, of this section, the council 81  Raised Bill No.  6622 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3946   	4 of 4 
 
shall work with the law enforcement unit to obtain and maintain such 82 
certification or accreditation standards. 83 
(g) If a law enforcement unit fails to comply with the guidance issued 84 
by the council pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (g) of section 7-85 
294d regarding reporting procedures to be followed by chief law 86 
enforcement officers for certificate suspension, cancellation or 87 
revocation, the council may revoke the certificate of compliance with the 88 
appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers, as the case may be, issued 89 
pursuant to this section. 90 
(h) No civil action may be brought against a law enforcement unit for 91 
damages arising from the failure of the law enforcement unit to (1) 92 
adopt and maintain such minimum standards and practices or a higher 93 
level of accreditation standards pursuant to subsection (b) of this 94 
section, or (2) obtain and maintain the appropriate certificate of 95 
compliance with the appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers or 96 
accreditation by the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 97 
Agencies, Inc., as required by subsections (c) to (e), inclusive, of this 98 
section. 99 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage 7-294ee 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To delay, by one year, certification or accreditation requirements for a 
law enforcement unit that serves a municipality and consists solely of 
constables or resident state troopers. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]