Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06622 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/28/2023

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	3/28/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6622  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CERTIFICATION OR ACCREDITATION 
REQUIREMENT DEADLINES FOR A LAW ENFORCEMENT UNIT 
THAT SERVES A MUNICIPALITY AND CONSISTS SOLELY OF 
CONSTABLES OR RESIDENT STATE TROOPERS.  
 
SUMMARY 
PA 22-119 made several changes to the minimum standards and 
practices for administering and managing law enforcement units (see 
BACKGROUND), including requiring that they be divided into three 
state-accreditation tiers. Units must generally be certified for each tier 
by certain dates culminating in, by 2026, either (1) being certified as 
meeting the requirements for all three state-accreditation tiers or (2) 
meeting a higher level of accreditation standards from the Commission 
on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. (CALEA). 
This bill changes the certification deadlines for units that serve a 
municipality and consist solely of constables or resident state troopers. 
It generally extends the prior deadline for them to be certified for tier 
one by one year and delays the current deadlines to be certified for tiers 
two and three each by one year. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage  
ADJUSTED MINIMUM STA NDARDS AND PRACTICES 
By law, the Police Officer Standards and Training Council (POST) 
and the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection 
(DESPP) must jointly develop, adopt, and revise, as necessary, 
minimum standards and practices for administering and managing law 
enforcement units. Among other things, PA 22-119 further required 
POST, within available appropriations, to divide the minimum 
standards and practices into three state-accreditation tiers by January 1, 
2023. This change effectively codified POST’s three-tiered accreditation  2023HB-06622-R000272-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	3/28/23 
 
structure that already existed before the act. 
Current law required law enforcement units to continue to adopt and 
maintain through December 31, 2022, (1) POST-DESPP’s minimum 
standards and practices or (2) a higher level of accreditation standards 
developed by POST or CALEA. Afterwards, as described in the table 
below, current law sets different minimum standards and practices for 
each state-accreditation tier and dates by which units must generally be 
certified for each tier. 
The bill creates a different schedule for units that serve a municipality 
and consist solely of constables or resident state troopers by extending 
each of the required certification dates by one year. For these units, they 
must adopt and maintain through December 31, 2023, (1) POST-
DESPP’s minimum standards and practices or (2) a higher level of 
accreditation standards developed by POST or CALEA. (It is not clear 
what these standards and practices consist of for the purposes of this 
requirement since, by law, they were to be changed and divided by 
January 1, 2023, for the purpose of implementing the accreditation tier 
certification requirements.) Afterwards, as described in the table below, 
the bill sets different minimum standards and practices for each state-
accreditation tier and dates by which these units must generally be 
certified for each tier. 
Table: Minimum Standards & Practices Tiers Schedule 
 	Tier I Tier II Tier III 
Minimum 
Standards & 
Practices 
Description 
Minimum standards 
and practices 
designed to protect 
law enforcement units 
from liability, enhance 
service delivery, and 
improve public 
confidence in units 
Minimum standards 
and practices for unit 
administration, 
management, and 
operation  
Higher minimum 
standards and 
practices for unit 
administration, 
management, and 
operation  
Current Law’s 
Required 
Certification 
Dates for All 
Units 
By January 1, 2023, 
and until December 
31, 2023 
By January 1, 2024, 
and until December 
31, 2025 
By January 1, 2026, 
and after 
Bill’s Required 
Certification 
By January 1, 2024, 
and until December 
By January 1, 2025, 
and until December 
By January 1, 2027, 
and after  2023HB-06622-R000272-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 3 	3/28/23 
 
 	Tier I Tier II Tier III 
Dates for 
Covered Units 
31, 2024 31, 2026 
 
By law, during the above tier schedules, units may alternatively meet 
higher accreditation standards developed by CALEA that are otherwise 
acceptable for each tier. Additionally, as units progress up the tier scale, 
they must maintain certification with the prior tier or tiers (e.g., at the 
tier three stage, they must ultimately be tiers one, two, and three 
certified).  
BACKGROUND 
Minimum Standards and Practices 
The current version of the DESPP-POST minimum standards and 
practices appears to be published within POST General Notice 20-04, 
which existed prior to PA 22-119. By law, they must be based on CALEA 
standards and include standards and practices for specified matters 
including bias-based policing, use of force, response to family violence 
crimes, body camera use, and police pursuits, among others. 
Law Enforcement Units 
By law, a “law enforcement unit” is any state or municipal agency or 
department (or tribal agency or department created and governed 
under a memorandum of agreement) whose primary functions include 
enforcing criminal or traffic laws; preserving public order; protecting 
life and property; or preventing, detecting, or investigating crime (CGS 
§ 7-294a(8)). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 25 Nay 0 (03/16/2023)