Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06622 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 08/31/2023

                    O F F I C E O F L E G I S L A T I V E R E S E A R C H 
P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 
  	Page 1 
PA 23-59—HB 6622 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CE RTIFICATION OR ACCRE DITATION 
REQUIREMENT DEADLINE S FOR A LAW ENFORCEM ENT UNIT 
THAT SERVES A MUNICIPALIT Y AND CONSISTS SOLEL Y OF 
CONSTABLES OR RESIDE NT STATE TROOPERS 
 
SUMMARY: PA 22-119 made several changes to the minimum standards and 
practices for administering and managing law enforcement units (see 
BACKGROUND), including requiring that they be divided into three state-
accreditation tiers. Units must generally be certified for each tier by certain dates 
culminating in, by 2026, either (1) being certified as meeting the requirements for 
all three state-accreditation tiers or (2) meeting a higher level of accreditation 
standards from the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, 
Inc. (CALEA). 
This act changes the certification deadlines for units that serve a municipality 
and consist solely of constables or resident state troopers. It generally extends the 
deadline for them to be certified for tier one by one year and delays the deadlines 
to be certified for tiers two and three each by one year. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage  
 
ADJUSTED MINIMUM STA NDARDS AND PRACTICES 
 
By law, the Police Officer Standards and Training Council (POST) and the 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection (DESPP) must jointly 
develop, adopt, and revise, as necessary, minimum standards and practices for 
administering and managing law enforcement units. Among other things, PA 22-
119 further required POST, within available appropriations, to divide the minimum 
standards and practices into three state-accreditation tiers by January 1, 2023. This 
change effectively codified POST’s three-tiered accreditation structure that already 
existed before the act. 
Prior law required law enforcement units to continue to adopt and maintain 
through December 31, 2022, (1) POST-DESPP’s minimum standards and practices 
or (2) a higher level of accreditation standards developed by POST or CALEA. 
Afterwards, as described in the table below, it set different minimum standards and 
practices for each state-accreditation tier and dates by which units had to generally 
be certified for each tier. 
The act creates a different schedule for units that serve a municipality and 
consist solely of constables or resident state troopers by extending each of the 
required certification dates by one year. These covered units must instead adopt and 
maintain through December 31, 2023, (1) POST-DESPP’s minimum standards and 
practices or (2) a higher level of accreditation standards developed by POST or  O L R P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 	Page 2 of 3  
CALEA. Afterwards, as described in the table below, the act sets different 
minimum standards and practices for each state-accreditation tier and dates by 
which these units must generally be certified for each tier. 
 
Minimum Standards & Practices Tiers Schedule 
 Tier I Tier II 	Tier III 
Minimum 
Standards & 
Practices 
Description 
Minimum standards 
and practices 
designed to protect 
law enforcement 
units from liability, 
enhance service 
delivery, and 
improve public 
confidence in units 
Minimum standards and 
practices for 
administering, managing, 
and operating law 
enforcement units 
Higher minimum standards 
and practices for 
administering, managing, and 
operating law enforcement 
units  
Prior Law’s 
Required 
Certification 
Dates for All 
Units 
By January 1, 2023, 
and until December 
31, 2023 
By January 1, 2024, and 
until December 31, 2025 
By January 1, 2026, and after 
Act’s 
Required 
Certification 
Dates for 
Covered 
Units 
By January 1, 2024, 
and until December 
31, 2024 
By January 1, 2025, and 
until December 31, 2026 
By January 1, 2027, and after 
 
By law, during the above tier schedules, units may alternatively meet higher 
accreditation standards developed by CALEA that are otherwise acceptable for 
each tier. Additionally, as units progress up the tier scale, they must maintain 
certification with the prior tier or tiers (e.g., at the tier three stage, they must 
ultimately be tiers one, two, and three certified).  
 
BACKGROUND 
 
Minimum Standards and Practices 
 
The current version of the POST-DESPP minimum standards and practices 
appears to be published within POST General Notice 20-04, which existed prior to 
PA 22-119. By law, they must be based on CALEA standards and include standards 
and practices for specified matters including bias-based policing, use of force, 
response to family violence crimes, body camera use, and police pursuits, among 
others. 
 
Law Enforcement Units 
 
By law, a “law enforcement unit” is any state or municipal agency or  O L R P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 	Page 3 of 3  
department (or tribal agency or department created and governed under a 
memorandum of agreement) whose primary functions include enforcing criminal 
or traffic laws; preserving public order; protecting life and property; or preventing, 
detecting, or investigating crime (CGS § 7-294a(8)).