House
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Public Act 23-66
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
File Number 763
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 490
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7638
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7563
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
File Number 89
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Calendar Number 81
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|