Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06642 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note March 16, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 15, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 12, 2023