House
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-148
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
File Number 791
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 524
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8156
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
File Number 58
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Calendar Number 62
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|