LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06643
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06643
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2023 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06643
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 14, 2023
Bill
February 8, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
August 14, 2023
Analysis
May 19, 2023
Analysis
May 17, 2023
Bill
April 17, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 14, 2023
Compare
Analysis
March 14, 2023
Chaptered
Bill
June 15, 2023
Compare