House
|
06/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-121
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
File Number 724
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 440
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6921
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
File Number 455
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House Calendar Number 292
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|