Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06729 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note April 5, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 11, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2023