House
|
06/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-122
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
File Number 837
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 563
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8644
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
File Number 474
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Calendar Number 300
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|