LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06731
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06731
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2023 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06731
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 26, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 6, 2023
Bill
February 16, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
August 28, 2023
Analysis
May 26, 2023
Analysis
May 25, 2023
Bill
April 17, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 6, 2023
Compare
Analysis
April 6, 2023
Chaptered
Bill
June 15, 2023
Compare