House
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Special Act 23-4
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
File Number 828
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 560
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8403
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
File Number 314
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Calendar Number 212
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|